CA AB187 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 84204.5 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: local ballot measure contribution and expenditure reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB187 Gloria By Stern (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 187 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 187 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2174.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1133.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 5). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 22). |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84204.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |