CA AB1864 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 17210 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: deductions: federal income tax paid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2018-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-02-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17210New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback