CA AB186 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 11376.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: overdose prevention program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 186 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB186 Eggman et al. By Wiener (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB186 Eggman et al. By Wiener Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB186 Eggman et al. By Wiener (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 186 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 6668.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 5544.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-16SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-15SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator De León.
2017-09-12SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2796.)
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 2796.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 2074.)
2017-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 25).
2017-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-23AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (March 21).
2017-03-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2017-01-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
2017-01-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11376.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback