CA AB1859 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 6600) to Chapter 6 of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 13401 of the Corporations Code, and to add Sections 2104.5, 8406, and 15605 to the Probate Code, relating to professional fiduciaries.
Title
Professional fiduciaries: professional corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1859 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4972.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 13401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 15605 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 2104.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 8406 | New Code | See Bill Text |