CA AB1856 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Disorderly conduct: distribution of intimate images.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |