CA AB1856 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1522.41 and 1529.2 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 16001.9 and 16003 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care services.
Title
Foster care services: cultural competency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1856 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1856 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1856 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1856 Ammiano By Leno (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1856 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6412.). | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4748.). | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-24 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4665.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1522.41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1529.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16001.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |