CA AB1851 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65913.6 to the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Religious institution affiliated housing development projects: parking requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1851 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments By RIVAS, R (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1851 Wicks et al. By Wiener (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1851 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1851 Wicks et al. By Wiener (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1851 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5225.). |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 4292.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 4753.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 2). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |