CA AB1849 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 21080.12 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: levees.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Logue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1849&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1849_bill_20140219_introduced.html |