CA AB1846 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3043.4 to the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parole hearings: victim attorneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3043.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |