CA AB1846 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11.1 (commencing with Section 1399.80) to Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 9.6 (commencing with Section 10930) to Part 2 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Consumer operated and oriented plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1846 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1846 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1846 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1846 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1846 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6385.). | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4756.). | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6). | |
2012-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH. | |
2012-05-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5049.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-21 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-02 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1399.80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10961 | New Code | See Bill Text |