CA AB1845 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8545 and 69614.3 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1797.165 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1845 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1845 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5116.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69614.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |