CA AB184 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13997.6 of, and to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 63100) to Division 1 of Title 6.7 of, the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Small Business Technical Assistance Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] |
Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Young Kim [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13997.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63100 | New Code | See Bill Text |