CA AB1839 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1839 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5113.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback