CA AB1827 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5849.35, 5849.4, and 5890 of, and to add Section 5849.15 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
No Place Like Home Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1827 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - AB 1827 BUDGET Concurrence - Urgency Added By TING (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - [06-18-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1827 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - AB 1827 BUDGET Concurrence - Urgency Added By TING (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - [06-18-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1827 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5981.). |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 20.) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 5980.) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4866.). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5107.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 53600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |