CA AB1827 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53395.1 and 53395.3 of the Government Code, relating to infrastructure financing districts.
Title
Infrastructure financing districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1827 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. | |
2012-05-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4706.) | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-17 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53395.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53395.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53395.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |