CA AB1826 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 87482.3 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: full-time instructors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 1826 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - AB 1826 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-04-30 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 4594.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25). | |
2012-03-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-20 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-03-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87482.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |