CA AB1821 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052, 17053.73, 17059.2, 18410.2, 19551, 19551.1, 19551.5, 23626, and 23689 of, and to add Section 17131.7 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1821 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1821 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5104.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18410.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19551.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19551.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |