CA AB1817 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 70, 216, 297.1, 298, 298.6, 304, 306.5, 400, 422, 781, 1102, 1615, 1816, 2024.7, 2033, 2034, 2040, 2102, 2104, 2106, 2124, 2610, 3011, 3012, 3025.5, 3027.5, 3041, 3042, 3044, 3047, 3048, 3105, 3110.5, 3111, 3115, 3118, 3180, 3192, 3651, 3664, 3691, 3751, 4014, 4053, 4059, 4063, 4076, 4205, 4251, 4325, 4330, 4331, 4351, 4400, 5246, 5601, 5603, 5611, 6228, 6275, 6302, 6303, 6306, 6320.5, 6323, 6343, 6345, 6380, 6381, 6383, 6389, 6404, 6454, 6750, 6752, 6924, 6929, 6930, 7120, 7541, 7554, 7572, 7573.5, 7574, 7577, 7580, 7611, 7613, 7613.5, 7630, 7635.5, 7643, 7646, 7648, 7662, 7663, 7664, 7666, 7667, 7822, 7825, 7851, 7882, 7901, 7911.1, 7950, 7960, 7962, 8502, 8545, 8603, 8604, 8606.5, 8613.7, 8619.5, 8620, 8625, 8632.5, 8700, 8700.5, 8712, 8715, 8730, 8800, 8801, 8801.3, 8801.5, 8811, 8814, 8814.5, 8908, 8920, 9000, 9101, 9203, 9205, 9208, 10005, 10014, 17000, 17212, 17300, 17309.5, 17400, 17400.5, 17404, 17404.1, 17406, 17416, 17422, 17430, 17433, 17450, 17514, 17518, 17520, 17522, 17525, 17528, 17530, 17550, 17552, 17600, 17602, 17703, 17801, 17803, 20026, and 20034 of the Family Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Assembly - AB 1817 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1817 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1817 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1817 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1817 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2484.). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1818.). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1261.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |