CA AB1817 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19636 and 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 3857, 4101, 4101.2, 4101.3, 4102, 4103, 4103.5, 4104, 4105, 4106, and 4108 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 11270, 12805, 13293, 13332.10, 13405, 15600, 16310, 100000, 100002, 100004, 100008, 100012, 100014, 100016, 100032, 100034, 100046, and 100049 of, to add Sections 12012.96, 13070.5, 13293.1, 13293.3, 13293.5, 13920, and 15570.31 to, and to add and repeal Article 7 (commencing with Section 12100.60) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50675.10 and 53561 of, and to add Sections 50406.8 and 53566 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 12905 of the Insurance Code, to add Section 987.010 to the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 3502, 3503, 12100, and 12102.2 of, and to add and repeal Sections 3503.5 and 3503.7 of, the Public Contract Code, to add Section 75218 to the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 90.50, 214, 215.1, 254.5, 254.6, 480.1, 480.2, and 6377.1 of, and to add Section 95.50 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Section 1088.9 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 12302.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - AB 1817 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1817 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1817 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
2018-06-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5813.).
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
2018-06-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4676.).
2018-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 13).
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5102.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19636Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26051.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code3857Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4101Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4101.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4101.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4102Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4103Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4103.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4104Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4105Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4106Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4108Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100000Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100002Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100004Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100008Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100012Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100014Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100016Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100032Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100034Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100046Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100049Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11270Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12012.96New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12100.60Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code12805Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13070.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13293Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13293.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13293.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13293.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13332.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13405Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13920New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code15570.31New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code15600Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16310Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50406.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code50675.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code53561Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code53566New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code987.010New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code12100Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code12102.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code3502Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code3503Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code3503.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code3503.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code75218New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code214Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code215.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code254.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code254.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code480.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code480.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6377.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code90.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code95.50New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1088.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code12905Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12302.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback