CA AB1815 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 212.1 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 12926 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: race: hairstyles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 212.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |