CA AB1815 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14169.53 of, to add Section 14184.90 to, and to add and repeal Section 14114 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1815 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2018-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-06-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5101.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14114Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14169.53Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14184.90New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback