CA AB1814 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 740.12 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Transportation electrification: community choice aggregators.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 740.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |