CA AB1813 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 185020 and 185022 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail.
Title
High-Speed Rail Authority: membership.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1813 Frazier (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1813 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1813 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4650.). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 185020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 185022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |