CA AB1809 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170.02 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Recall and resentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |