CA AB1809 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 95504 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 11151, 11322.5, 11375, 11450, 11450.5, 14140, and 18923 of, and to repeal Sections 11155, 11155.1, 11155.2, 11155.6, 11157.5, 11257, 11257.5, and 11260 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs eligibility: asset limits.
Sponsors
Asm. Patty Lopez [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1809 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1809 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 5183.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 29). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |