CA AB1809 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 121720) to Part 6 of Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to veterinary public health.
Title
Dogs: health certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 1809 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1809 Maienschein By Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1809 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1809 Maienschein By Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1809 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6044.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4422.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5111.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 121720 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |