CA AB1809 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100520 of the Government Code, to amend Section 1367.003 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10112.25 and 12923.5 of, and to repeal Sections 12693.925 and 12693.95 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-02 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-01 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Read first time. To print. |