CA AB1807 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 (Chapter 14 of the Statutes of 2017) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2017: augmentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1807 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1807 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (June 13). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5097.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |