CA AB1806 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 722, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 722, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 951.5 and 955 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veteran interment.
Title
Veteran interment: veterans' remains organizations.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Cook [R] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1806 COOK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1806 Cook By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1806 COOK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1806 Cook By Correa (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1806 COOK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 722, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6508.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4890.). | |
2012-08-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-06-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4889.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-27 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 951.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 952 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 955 | New Code | See Bill Text |