CA AB1805 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21099 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Environment: California Environmental Quality Act (CEQA).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | |
2010-03-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | |
2010-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2010-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1805&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1805_bill_20100210_introduced.html |