CA AB1802 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 113, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1358.20, 1368.015, 1368.02, 1371, and 1373.65 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care service plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care service plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1802 HEALTH (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1802 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 113, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1879.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1773.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2019-02-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback