CA AB18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 853 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Healing arts: Licensed Physicians and Dentists from Mexico Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 18 GARCIA, E. Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 18 GARCIA, E. Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | (Coms. on N.R.&W. and GOV. & F.) |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2290.) |
2017-08-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 645.). |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-02-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (February 22). |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (February 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5880 | New Code | See Bill Text |