CA AB1794 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8616.5 of the Family Code, and to amend Sections 294, 366.26, 366.3, and 16002 of, and to add Section 366.30 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare.
Title
Postadoption contact agreements: reinstatement of parental rights.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1794 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB1794 Gipson By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1794 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent AB1794 Gipson By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1794 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5364.). |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2022-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 8616.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 294 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |