CA AB1790 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 1.4C (commencing with Section 1749.7) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marketplaces: marketplace sellers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1790 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Wi (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Wicks et al. By Jackson (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1790 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3502.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2861.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-12SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1764.)
2019-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1749.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback