CA AB179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14504 of, and to add Section 14516 to, the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
California Transportation Commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 179 CERVANTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB179 Cervantes et al. By Beall (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 179 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB179 Cervantes et al. By Beall (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 179 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 2913.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2339.). |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 11). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1787.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 3). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14506.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14516 | New Code | See Bill Text |