CA AB1788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12978.7 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticides: use of second generation anticoagulant rodenticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1788 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1788 Bloom et al. By Allen (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1788 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1788 Bloom et al. By Allen (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1788 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 5472.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5466.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 7.). |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 1512.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 12978.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |