CA AB1787 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 120161, 120162, and 120163 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to communicable diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting: Valley Fever.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 1787 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1787 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1787 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6238.).
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5160.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-29SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2018-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code120161New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120162New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120163New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback