CA AB1783 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6027 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Board of State and Community Corrections: recidivism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 6027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1783 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1783 |