CA AB1782 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 162, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 424.7 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surfing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 1782 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1782 Muratsuchi et al. By Stern (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1782 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 162, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 6134.).
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5036.).
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5157.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.)
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2018-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code424.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback