CA AB178 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2847 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Board of Vocational Nursing and Psychiatric Technicians of the State of California: executive officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 178 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB178 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 178 BONILLA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB178 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 178 BONILLA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2865.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2402.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1701.). |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1752.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2841 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2847.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2858.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5517 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |