CA AB1778 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 6.8 (commencing with Section 64500) to the Government Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Transit-Oriented Redevelopment Law of 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 64500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1778 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1778 |