CA AB1777 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13605 to the Penal Code, relating to the Commission on Correctional Peace Officer Standards and Training.
Title
Commission on Correctional Peace Officer Standards and Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13605 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1777 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1777 |