CA AB1775 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6245 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lands: leasing: oil and gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1775 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1775 Muratsuchi et al. By Jackson (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1775 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-08 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 6878.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 5882.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 24. Page 5545.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code6245New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback