CA AB1771 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 989, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65584, 65584.01, 65584.04, 65584.05, and 65584.06 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: regional housing needs assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1771 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1771 Bloom By Wiener (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1771 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 989, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 7025.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 5997.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5593.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 11).
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback