CA AB1768 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1720 of the Labor Code, relating to prevailing wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevailing wage: public works.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1768 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1768 Carrillo By Hill (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1768 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 3426.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2758.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 2. Page 1633.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 8).
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1720Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1729Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback