CA AB1756 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44259.1 of the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: integrated programs of professional preparation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1756 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5022.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 16). |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44259.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |