CA AB175 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 11191 of the Penal Code, relating to inmates, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Inmates: transfers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-03-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-01-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. | |
2011-01-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11191 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |