CA AB1746 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 962, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 784.7 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: jurisdiction of public offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1746 CERVANTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1746 Cervantes et al. By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 1746 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 962, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6628.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5594.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2018-04-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4525.)
2018-03-19AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4297.)
2018-03-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 6).
2018-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
2018-01-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code784.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback