CA AB1744 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 844, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 844, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 226 and 2810.5 of, and to add Section 226.1 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employee compensation: itemized statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1744 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1744 Bonnie Lowenthal By Leno (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1744 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1744 Bonnie Lowenthal By Leno (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1744 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 844, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6775.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6795.). | |
2012-08-31 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5077.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. No | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5142.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2012-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 226.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2810.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 970 | Amended Code | Citation Text |