CA AB1743 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53070, 53071, 53073, 53075, and 53076 of, and to add Sections 53076.1 and 53076.2 to, the Education Code, relating to career technical education.
Title
California Career Technical Education Incentive Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1743 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5516.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 53070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53071 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53076.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 53076.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |